Financial history SHAPE-UK LTD

Charity number: 1148949
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/03/2020 30/03/2021 30/03/2022 30/03/2023 30/03/2024
Total gross income £81.10k £81.30k £127.27k £197.64k £231.05k
Total expenditure £77.98k £80.45k £120.22k £194.51k £163.89k
Income from government contracts £39.80k N/A N/A £60.36k N/A
Income from government grants £39.80k £18.00k £115.42k £46.00k £47.12k