Financial history BERKELEY BOOKS

Charity number: 1149718
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £17.32k £27.46k £12.63k £65.84k £47.25k
Total expenditure £18.62k £15.56k £16.84k £17.84k £35.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £27.19k £10.72k £53.74k £34.52k