ROSHNI SHEFFIELD ASIAN WOMEN'S RESOURCE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Roshni is a resource centre for South Asian women living in Sheffield. The aim of the organisation is to advance the welfare and education of women and this is done through the provision of a range of services and projects in a female only environment; where specific language and cultural needs are met.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £20,000 from 2 government contract(s) and £300,000 from 6 government grant(s)
People

8 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 27 September 2012: Standard registration
- 01 September 2014: Funds received from 1007292 ROSHNI SHEFFIELD ASIAN WOMEN'S RESOURCE CENTRE
- ROSHNI SHEFFIELD (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fazeela Hussain | Trustee | 11 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
FARHANA ZAMAN | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Najma Carles | Trustee | 07 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
Shahnaz Bano | Trustee | 18 November 2013 |
|
|
||||
GHAZALA MUNIR | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ZOHRAN CHOUDHRY | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ASIMA KHAN | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
KALPANA DESAI | Trustee | 04 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £184.50k | £216.73k | £398.49k | £398.49k | £349.61k | |
|
Total expenditure | £201.00k | £193.83k | £316.06k | £316.06k | £367.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £30.00k | £20.00k | £108.00k | £25.00k | £20.00k | |
|
Income from government grants | £35.00k | £55.00k | N/A | £25.00k | £300.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 08 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 15 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
3.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION (INCLUDING SOCIAL AND PHYSICAL TRAINING) OF ASIAN WOMEN IN THE CITY OF SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT")AND 3.2.2 TO ESTABLISH AN INDEPENDENT AND IMPARTIAL CENTRE (REFERRED TO AS "THE CENTRE") FOR THE USE OF THOSE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND MEMBERS OF THE CHARITY AND TO CO-OPERATE WITH THE SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL IN MAINTAINING AND MANAGING THE CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY WHICH HELP TO ACHIEVE THE OBJECTS IN ARTICLE 3.2.1.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
444 LONDON ROAD
SHEFFIELD
S2 4HP
- Phone:
- 01142508898
- Email:
- admin@roshnisheffield.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window