ASHRITHA FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CHITTAMOR MANDAI, INDIA BY THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF A SCHOOL. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIPS IN INDIA AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. 3. THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH IN INDIA AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- India
Governance
- 05 August 2013: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SANDHYA ELIZABETH FRENCH BSC | Chair | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Sayer KCSJ | Trustee | 28 August 2021 |
|
|||||
DEVINA KOONJUL | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER RAHUL FRENCH | Trustee | 07 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 07 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 15/07/2013
Charitable objects
1. TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN CHITTAMOR MANDAI, INDIA BY THE PROVISION AND OPERATION OF A SCHOOL. 2. THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND FINANCIAL HARDSHIPS IN INDIA AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE. 3. THE PROMOTION AND PRESERVATION OF GOOD HEALTH IN INDIA AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
157 BITTACY RISE
LONDON
NW7 2HJ
- Phone:
- 07946511176
- Email:
- info@ashrithafoundation.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window