THE CHRIST CHURCH GOSPEL PARTNERS' FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity has supported 2 ministry workers and 13 ministry associates during the seventeen month period ended 31st August 2015. They have worked full time, supporting local churches, receiving both on the job and structured training from courses and conferences and providing pastoral care.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Southampton City
Governance
- 10 January 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nigel Paul Bridges | Chair | 09 September 2012 |
|
|||||||
James Jonathan Welch Roberts | Trustee | 16 June 2020 |
|
|
||||||
Francis Edward Orlando Saer | Trustee | 09 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2019 | 30/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £55.14k | £39.03k | £38.87k | £107.69k | £76.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £59.89k | £14.82k | £5.50k | £161.15k | £69.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 02 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 August 2019 | 10 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2019 | 10 October 2019 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 09 NOV 2010
Charitable objects
"THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC: 2.2.1 TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS FOR THOSE SEEKING TO TRAIN IN CHRISTIAN MINISTRY; THE PROVISION OF PASTORAL CARE TO INDIVIDUALS IN NEED; AND THE SUPPORT OF CHRIST CHURCH SOUTHAMPTON AND OTHER CHURCHES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY THINK FIT. 2.2.2 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN THE CITY OF SOUTHAMPTON AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME MAY THINK FIT THROUGH PROVIDING COURSES, TUITION AND LESSONS IN CHRISTIAN DOCTRINE OPEN TO MEMBERS OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 REDHILL CLOSE
SOUTHAMPTON
SO16 7BT
- Phone:
- 07903871816
- Email:
- james.jwroberts@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window