Team Lewis Foundation

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide grants to beneficiaries to enable them to undertake a course of study in the creative arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 14 September 2012: Standard registration
- KUPAMBANA (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRIS LEWIS | Chair | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANDRES WITTERMANN | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
JAMES MATTHEW OEHLCKE | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.00k | £10.00k | £15.00k | £17.40k | £46.19k | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.43k | £8.30k | £25.75k | £36.47k | £36.26k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 12 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 16 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 09 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 27 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 30 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25 JUN 2012 as amended on 19 Jul 2019
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROMOTE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE CREATIVE ARTS THROUGH ANY OR ALL OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: A) GIVING GRANTS, BURSARIES, OTHER PAYMENTS OR OTHER FORMS OF ASSISTANCE TO INDIVIDUALS IN FULL OR PART TIME EDUCATION OR TO EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS ATTENDED BY SUCH BENEFICIARIES TO ENABLE THEM TO CONTINUE OR UNDERTAKE A COURSE OF STUDY OR TRAINING RELATING TO THE CREATIVE ARTS; OR TO ENABLE THEM TO TRAVEL ABROAD TO PURSUE THEIR EDUCATION IN THE CREATIVE ARTS; B) GIVING GRANTS OR OTHER PAYMENTS TO INDIVIDUALS, INSTITUTIONS OR OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO ENABLE THEM TO UNDERTAKE ALL FORMS OF RESEARCH AND DEVELOPMENT INTO THE CREATIVE ARTS, CREATE PIECES OF WORK AND / OR TO DISPLAY PIECES OF CREATIVE ART; C) ANY OTHER LAWFUL ACTIVITIES WHICH PROMOTE THE CREATIVE ARTS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Lewis Communications Ltd
50 Electric Boulevard
LONDON
SW11 8BJ
- Phone:
- 02078022626
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window