REAL LIFE CHURCH, SUTTON COLDFIELD

Charity number: 1149821
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Our vision is to see and have a large, influential and reproducing church with many people in Sutton Coldfield coming into an experience of knowing Jesus as their Lord, Saviour and friend. To achieve the objectives the following activities are undertaken. Sunday meetings to worship, teach & pray for those attending, small mid-week "Life Groups" for church members, children's & youth activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £246,968
Total expenditure: £251,619

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Birmingham City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 November 2012: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Aaron Abraham Trustee 21 March 2022
None on record
ANDREW MATTHEW ROBERT PINDER Trustee 18 October 2012
None on record
STUART MATTHEW CRANE Trustee 18 October 2012
None on record
CHARLOTTE SENIOR Trustee 18 October 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £231.45k £226.35k £228.17k £228.17k £246.97k
Total expenditure £179.44k £165.09k £179.54k £179.54k £251.62k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 29 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 12 November 2023 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 12 November 2023 12 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 November 2022 8 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 08 November 2022 8 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 28 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 22 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
3 Aragon Drive
SUTTON COLDFIELD
West Midlands
B73 6BQ
Phone:
07594592773