GREENWICH STUDENTS UNION LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Union's objects are the advancement of education of Students at The University by:- Promoting the interests and welfare of students at the University during their course of study and representing, supporting and advising Students. Providing social, cultural, sporting and recreational activities. Being the recognised representative channel between students and the University
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023
Total income:
£4,728,115
Donations and legacies | £3.15m | |
Charitable activities | £1.58m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,464,542
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £4.46m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £4.46m | |
Retained for future use | £263.57k |
People

52 Employee(s)
12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Greenwich
- Medway
Governance
- 19 October 2012: Standard registration
- STUDENTS UNION UNIVERSITY OF GREENWICH (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emma Bryan | Chair | 09 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ameen Chowdhury | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amrutha Gullapalli | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Ilie Taralunga | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Aymen El Morabet | Trustee | 19 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Floyd Derek Martin Scott Macdonald | Trustee | 06 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Howard Hunt | Trustee | 07 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mateusz Jan Pudlak | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
MD Aminul Islam | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sodiq Ayobami Lawal | Trustee | 19 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Gary HALL | Trustee | 30 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
PAUL GARETH BUTLER | Trustee | 26 January 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.23m | £2.84m | £2.61m | £4.09m | £4.73m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.97m | £2.64m | £2.45m | £3.81m | £4.46m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £103.74k | £113.18k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.98m | £1.72m | £1.80m | £2.72m | £3.15m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £884.22k | £823.46k | £380.19k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £348.76k | £175.89k | £330.50k | £1.37m | £1.58m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £376 | £578 | £14 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £16.23k | £116.04k | £99.31k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.38m | £1.14m | £1.47m | £3.81m | £4.46m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.22m | £1.50m | £977.15k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £14.06k | £12.09k | £12.39k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £368.93k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2019 | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £364.30k | £238.61k | £150.55k | £132.53k | £57.99k | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £414.32k | £601.59k | £910.62k | £1.55m | £1.50m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£1.22m | -£1.62m | -£1.55m | -£1.23m | -£1.18m | |
|
Total liabilities | £353.98k | £308.73k | £477.29k | £939.75k | £689.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 23 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | 09 June 2022 | 9 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 28 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2019 | 31 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14 MAR 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 04 OCT 2018
Charitable objects
THE UNIONS OBJECTS ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:- 1) PROMOTING THE INTERESTS AND WELFARE OF STUDENTS AT THE UNIVERSITY DURING THEIR COURSE OF STUDY AND REPRESENTING, SUPPORTING AND ADVISING STUDENTS. 2) PROVIDING SOCIAL, CULTURAL, SPORTING AND RECREATIONAL ACTIVITIES, AND FORUMS FOR DISCUSSIONS AND DEBATE FOR THE PERSONAL DEVELOPMENT OF ITS STUDENTS. 3) BEING THE RECOGNISED REPRESENTATIVE CHANNEL BETWEEN STUDENTS AND THE UNIVERSITY AND ANY OTHER EXTERNAL BODIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
GREENWICH STUDENTS' UNION
DREADNOUGHT BUILDING
30 PARK ROW
GREENWICH
LONDON
SE10 9LS
- Phone:
- 02083318593
- Email:
- suwebsite@gre.ac.uk
- Website:
-
greenwichsu.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window