WOLVERCOTE YOUNG PEOPLES CLUB LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The organisation will run a youth club for young people who live in Wolvercote and Cutteslowe areas, providing a variety of activities physical, spiritually and mentally challenging as organised by fully qualified youth workers and appropriate helpers. The club will be open on a regular basis to provide these activities to young people ranging from 7 to 19 years of age.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Disability
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 27 September 2012: Standard registration
- 23 April 2020: Funds received from 1113912 WOLVERCOTE YOUNG PEOPLE'S CLUB CHARITABLE TRUST
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Valerie Elizabeth Tate | Chair | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew William Fenton | Trustee | 18 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JAMES DUTHIE | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £81.33k | £96.53k | £77.97k | £88.80k | £125.30k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.65k | £101.70k | £111.48k | £98.25k | £67.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £16.47k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.54k | £346 | £1.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 29 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 March 2022 | 29 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 33 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 March 2021 | 33 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02 JUL 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL, PHYSICAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN WOLVERCOTE AND CUTTESLOWE BY PROVIDING A SAFE PLACE WHERE THEY CAN GROW, LEARN AND FLOURISH UNDER THE GUIDANCE OF QUALIFIED YOUTH WORKERS AND TRAINED VOLUNTEERS, SUCH THAT THEY MAKE A POSITIVE CONTRIBUTION TO THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND WIDER SOCIETY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Astral Accountancy Services Ltd
Astral House
Granville Way
BICESTER
Oxfordshire
OX26 4JT
- Phone:
- 01865 559374
- Email:
- admin@wypc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window