DERBY ROAD BAPTIST CHURCH WATFORD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our main activities are Sunday services, morning and evening, with classes for children and young people; midweek house groups, evangelistic open-air activities, Childrens' Club, youth group, Parents & Toddlers together with other activities designed to promote the Christian faith. As charity trustees, we have each considered the Charity Commission's guidelines on Public Benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 24 August 2012: Standard registration
- DRBC (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ashkan Sarmadi | Chair | 31 August 2018 |
|
|||||
Matthew Hibbard | Trustee | 28 April 2019 |
|
|||||
Mark Timothy Stevens | Trustee | 24 April 2018 |
|
|||||
Carol Firman | Trustee | 26 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Alan Singleton | Trustee | 25 October 2014 |
|
|||||
STUART GRANT MEYRICK-BROOK | Trustee | 24 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.87k | £105.10k | £100.34k | £107.88k | £129.74k | |
|
Total expenditure | £92.04k | £90.30k | £85.56k | £110.28k | £124.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 23 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26 JUL 2011
Charitable objects
THE PRINCIPAL OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACCORDING TO BAPTIST PRINCIPLES AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE BASIS OF FAITH AS STATED IN SCHEDULE 1. THE CHARITY MAY ALSO CARRY OUT OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND/OR OTHER PARTS OF THE WORLD.
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 The Meadows
WATFORD
WD25 9AH
- Phone:
- 07759 726 054
- Email:
- abiliopinto@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window