TOPS ON STAGE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TOPS on Stage provide management and find raising support to Thurrock Operatic Society in order that local citizens may enjoy all forms of musical theatre. The fund raising efforts of the charity help to support the broad challenges and opportunities in musical theatre making participation and viewing accessible by all. In particular, we encourage and support the development of young people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £3,990 from 1 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Thurrock
Governance
- 12 December 2012: Standard registration
- TOPS ON STAGE (Working name)
- THURROCK OPERATIC SOCIETY (TOPS) (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Luke Coldham | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liane Alton | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hollie Davy | Trustee | 13 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
DAWN PEAT | Trustee | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.40k | £35.33k | £7.74k | £49.62k | £28.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £35.67k | £37.73k | £16.79k | £52.69k | £23.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | N/A | £3.99k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 29 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 29 August 2023 | 302 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 102 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 10 February 2022 | 102 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 12 February 2021 | 12 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 05 MAY 2011 AS AMENDED ON 22/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE DRAMATIC AND OPERATIC ARTS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: PRESENTING QUALITY AMATEUR PERFORMANCES OF OPERAS, OPERETTAS, MUSICALS AND OTHER WORKS; SEEKING TO ENCOURAGE AND DEVELOP PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND TASTE IN THE ARTS OF ALL FORMS OF MUSIC.
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 Blackshots Lane
GRAYS
Essex
RM16 2JT
- Phone:
- 07707146976
- Email:
- chairman@topsonstage.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window