Financial history RISING STARS THEATRE COMPANY

Charity number: 1150783
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £21.65k £10.31k £16.06k £22.47k £30.38k
Total expenditure £12.38k £14.77k £18.43k £26.22k £26.43k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A