Financial history UMAR EDUCATION AND WELFARE TRUST, COVENTRY (UEWT)

Charity Number: 1150101
Charity reporting is overdue by 101 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2019 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023
Total gross income £49.38k £24.17k £21.24k £63.83k £86.13k
Total expenditure £11.16k £13.96k £11.89k £22.16k £24.18k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £2.34k N/A N/A