THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF SHEERING

Charity Number: 1149115
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

St. Mary's PCC has the responsibility of co-operating with the Priest in Charge, the Rev (Mrs) Sophie Helen Weller, in promoting in the ecclesiastical parish the whole mission of the Church, pastoral, evangelistic, social and ecumenical. It also has maintenance responsibilities for the Church, Church Room and grounds.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £36,650
Total expenditure: £39,756

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Essex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 September 2012: Previously excepted registration
Organisation type:
Previously excepted
Other names:
  • SHEERING ST MARY THE VIRGIN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Sophie Helen Weller Chair 23 September 2024
None on record
Barbara Aylmer Trustee 08 May 2022
None on record
Dr Nandiran Ratnavel Trustee 23 May 2021
None on record
FIONA MARGARET KLIMCKE Trustee 01 April 2017
None on record
ELSIE JOAN BAKER Trustee 17 April 2016
None on record
MRS J A POTTER Trustee 09 September 2012
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £34.12k £32.56k £29.45k £41.37k £36.65k
Total expenditure £29.18k £33.88k £32.25k £38.21k £39.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 13 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 13 May 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 26 May 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 26 May 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 18 May 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 03 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
The Vicarage
Broomfields
Hatfield Heath
Bishop's Stortford
CM22 7EH
Phone:
01279730288