WORLD SIGHT FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity contributes to saving vision through the education of ophthalmic personnel in developing countries. We favour short teaching courses using international and local expert teachers . We promote an educational culture of self help so that attendees achieve not only a higher standard of practice but to seek to be the architects of their own professional development and advancement.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
15 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Other Charitable Activities
- China
- India
- Kenya
- Lesotho
- South Africa
Governance
- 30 August 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY HUGH CHIGNELL | Chair | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
||||
Robin Mackenzie | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
David John Brazier | Trustee | 01 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Bruce James | Trustee | 01 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Clare Gilbert | Trustee | 01 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGUERITE MILLS | Trustee | 05 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
GEORGINA NATALIE CHIGNELL | Trustee | 28 August 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.91k | £74.19k | £68.02k | £90.36k | £98.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.89k | £557 | £47.34k | £97.14k | £163.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 16 APR 2012
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: TO PROMOTE THE PREVENTION AND CURE OF BLINDNESS ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD TO CARRY OUT ANY EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES ANCILLARY TO THE ABOVE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 TEDWORTH SQUARE
LONDON
SW3 4DU
- Phone:
- 02073525281
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window