Accounts and annual returns HEAVEN CAN WAIT I'M BUSY

Charity Number: 1151588
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2019 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2018 Not submitted
Annual return 30 April 2017 26 June 2018 118 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2017 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2016 11 July 2017 133 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2016 Not Required