Financial history Brave Futures

Charity number: 1149347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £539.08k £653.78k £558.23k £622.35k £739.86k
Total expenditure £497.91k £463.37k £575.84k £642.63k £789.06k
Income from government contracts £238.86k £260.00k £283.46k £334.70k £415.31k
Income from government grants £14.60k £60.04k £10.00k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £285.15k £343.78k £207.57k £267.42k £318.71k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £253.56k £309.90k £350.63k £353.45k £415.31k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £374 £107 £36 £1.47k £5.83k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £428.81k £402.96k £505.62k £557.08k £702.33k
Expenditure - Raising funds £69.10k £60.41k £70.22k £85.55k £86.73k
Expenditure - Governance £0 £0 £0 £2.82k £0
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0