Trustees Brave Futures

Charity number: 1149347
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Katherine Ahluwalia Trustee 22 February 2024
None on record
Sharon Brown Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
Jessica Bettis Trustee 22 June 2023
None on record
STEPHEN DEREK FLORY Trustee 11 August 2022
None on record
Kesha Allen Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Emma Clifton Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Evril Silver Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Keri Symonds Trustee 11 November 2021
None on record
Oliver Gravell Trustee 14 June 2018
None on record