PHILADELPHIA CRICKET AND COMMUNITY CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We have been a cricket club since 1868 and were awarded charity status to enable the club to expand and meet the wider demands of the local community. In addition to providing cricket opportunities for five junior teams, a ladies team and four senior teams we are now very much a community club used by local people for a wide range of functions as well as community groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Durham
- Sunderland
Governance
- 07 March 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MALCOLM PRATT MBE DL | Chair | 15 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Shaun Smith | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Scott Walton | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Janet Raine | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
BERYL PRATT | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|||||
Craig Galley | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Acton | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Rene Grosvenor | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Thomas Raine | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Neil MacKnight | Trustee | 26 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
WILLIAM DAVID CARR | Trustee | 07 March 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £212.27k | £95.67k | £254.31k | £219.09k | £271.44k | |
|
Total expenditure | £218.30k | £90.93k | £195.49k | £154.36k | £232.47k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £10.00k | £21.57k | £11.75k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 19 August 2024 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 02 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 27 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 27 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 30/01/2013 AS AMENDED ON 31/01/2013
Charitable objects
THE PROMOTION OF AMATEUR SPORT THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR CRICKET AND COACHING.TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE CITY OF SUNDERLAND AND SURROUNDING AREAS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,NATIONALITY,AGE,DISABILITY,RACE OR OF POLITICAL RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS,BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND STATUTORY AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Castle View
Chester le Street
DH3 3XA
- Phone:
- 01913890484
- Email:
- malcolmp1940@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window