LIGHTHOUSE CONSTRUCTION INDUSTRY CHARITY

Charity Number: 1149488
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provide emergency financial assistance, welfare and wellbeing advice and emotional and legal support to the construction industry workforce and their families in times of hardship and stress. Promote initiatives aimed at avoiding accident and improving safety and health on construction sites. Deliver local and national events that embrace networking, fundraising and fun within the industry.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales
  • Ireland
  • Northern Ireland
  • Scotland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 2012: Standard registration
  • 12 June 2014: Funds received from 205670 THE LIGHTHOUSE CLUB BENEVOLENT FUND
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • LCIC OR LIGHTHOUSECIC (Working name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

10 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR EWARD GEORGE NAYLOR Chair 01 October 2015
None on record
Joanna MULCAHY Trustee 18 July 2024
None on record
Justin Mendelle Trustee 11 April 2024
None on record
Ian Carey Trustee 03 October 2023
None on record
Robert Brown Trustee 27 April 2023
Leo Lion Foundation
Received: On time
HABITAT FOR HUMANITY GREAT BRITAIN
Received: On time
Joanne CONWAY Trustee 27 April 2023
None on record
Ryan OLoughlin Trustee 29 April 2021
None on record
RUTH DEVINE Trustee 18 December 2020
THE ECA/M A STOTHERS EDUCATIONAL TRUST
Received: On time
Joanna Vezey Trustee 28 March 2019
None on record
LYNDSEY GALLAGHER Trustee 08 April 2016
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £2.10m £2.16m £2.28m £3.69m £3.36m
Total expenditure £1.90m £1.10m £1.90m £3.02m £3.59m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.18m £1.90m £1.58m £2.10m £2.58m
Income - Other trading activities £489.35k £82.62k £478.25k £1.44m £498.33k
Income - Charitable activities £434.27k £183.46k £217.78k £135.61k £248.43k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £3.24k £3.01k £5.83k £15.27k £33.71k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.22m £723.82k £1.11m £1.55m £2.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £677.45k £378.15k £796.02k £1.47m £1.32m
Expenditure - Governance £18.16k £0 £32.95k £25.99k £35.24k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Own use assets £652 £2.09k £3.71k £13.22k £11.46k
Long-term investments £277.66k £824.06k £892.35k £1.68m £1.78m
Other assets £898.77k £1.79m £2.22m £1.73m £1.55m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £61.17k £390.61k £443.59k £290.92k £362.94k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 16 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 13 June 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 15 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 15 June 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 28 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

28 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Suffolk Enterprise Centre
Felaw Maltings
44 Felaw Street
IPSWICH
IP2 8SJ
Phone:
03456091956