FAST PROJECT - LONDON
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EQUIPPING PEOPLE IN AND AROUND THE PATMORE ESTATE LONDON TO POSITIVELY CONTRIBUTE TO THE TRANSFORMATION OF THEIR OWN LIVES, FAMILIES AND COMMUNITY. BUILDING A SAFE AND HEALTHY ENVIRONMENT TOGETHER WHERE ALL BELONG AND SHARE HOPE FOR THE FUTURE. INCLUDING OUTREACH, SPORT, MENTORING, EMPLOYABILITY, FILM, TRIPS & COMMUNITY EVENTS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2014
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Lambeth
- Wandsworth
Governance
- 26 October 2012: Standard registration
- 30 November 2015: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 30 November 2015: Funds transferred to 1152146 E:MERGE (UK) LIMITED
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £22.80k | £35.02k | |
|
Total expenditure | £14.26k | £36.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 13 November 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 01 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 01 August 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 27 November 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 13 August 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 19/10/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS (“OBJECTS) ARE UNDERTAKEN WITH A CHRISTIAN ETHOS FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT SPECIFICALLY RESTRICTED TO THE FOLLOWING:- 1)TO ADVANCE IN LIFE AND RELIEVE NEEDS OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGH:(A)THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; B)PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ACTIVITIES WHICH DEVELOP THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS. 2)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE. 3)TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window