NEXT STEPS MENTAL HEALTH RESOURCE CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Next Steps supports people with mental health problems in Ryedale, North Yorkshire, by providing a drop in centre, activities and outreach projects. Next Steps is governed by Trustees, which includes local professionals and service users. Our objectives are to provide emotional support, information, guidance, sign posting, rehabilitative activities and training opportunities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £31,869 from 1 government contract(s) and £36,020 from 6 government grant(s)
People

11 Trustee(s)
65 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 27 November 2012: Standard registration
- 14 January 2015: Funds received from 1090367 NEXT STEPS
- NEXT STEPS (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALAN GEORGE EVANS | Chair | 12 November 2012 |
|
|
||||||||||
Anna Guest | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linda Shipley | Trustee | 26 September 2024 |
|
|
||||||||||
John Mackenzie | Trustee | 13 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Joesph Wade | Trustee | 27 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Standring Marston | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Linda Parker | Trustee | 14 October 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
David Evans | Trustee | 25 September 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
alistair Duncan | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID BREWSTER | Trustee | 26 November 2016 |
|
|||||||||||
DINAH ELIZABETH KEAL | Trustee | 12 November 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £238.94k | £208.31k | £243.74k | £223.01k | £290.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £182.47k | £153.99k | £159.32k | £209.77k | £265.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £31.50k | N/A | £21.00k | £31.87k | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.02k | £11.59k | £63.42k | £31.01k | £36.02k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 09 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2020
(These accounts |
09 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 18/03/2011
Charitable objects
THE SUPPORT OF PEOPLE WITHIN RYEDALE, NORTH YORKSHIRE WHO HAVE OR HAVE PREVIOUSLY EXPERIENCED MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND CARERS AND FAMILIES OF SUCH PERSONS, IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION BY THE PROVISION OF RESOURCE CENTRES OFFERING ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT AND INFORMATION TO SUCH PERSONS OR BY OUTREACH PROJECTS AND ACTIVITIES. TO PROVIDE EMOTIONAL SUPPORT, INFORMATION, GUIDANCE, SIGN-POSTING AND REHABILITATION ACTIVITIES TO ENCOURAGE MENTAL AND PHYSICAL WELLBEING AND TRAINING OPPORTUNITIES TO THOSE PEOPLE WITH MENTAL HEALTH ISSUES AND THEIR CARERS AND FAMILIES.
Area of benefit
LOCAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Next Steps
7 Church Street
Norton
MALTON
YO17 9HP
- Phone:
- 01653690854
- Email:
- post@nextstepsryedale.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window