Financial history BROADEN OUT THEIR HORIZONS

Charity number: 1151289
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2019 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023
Total gross income £6.62k £8.37k £359 £125 £16.43k
Total expenditure £16.75k £13.27k £101 £103 £3.38k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A