POS+ABILITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED STROKES OR OTHER LONG TERM NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS (LTNC) AND THEIR CARERS, LIVING IN THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE AREA
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr IAN LINDSAY | Chair | 10 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Frances Nangle | Trustee | 27 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Elisabeth Haverson | Trustee | 03 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Claire Davis | Trustee | 08 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
RICHARD OLIVER SETCHELL | Trustee | 08 July 2021 |
|
|||||
Lady AVA PAICE | Trustee | 21 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £45.44k | £48.69k | £39.60k | £39.50k | £64.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.04k | £33.88k | £41.34k | £58.38k | £61.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £500 | £16.93k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 06 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21 NOV 2011 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE TO PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE SUFFERED STROKES OR OTHER LONG TERM NEUROLOGICAL CONDITIONS (LTNC) AND THEIR CARERS, LIVING IN THE CAMBRIDGESHIRE AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY: 2.1 THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, PEER SUPPORT AND ORGANISED ACTIVITIES TO ENCOURAGE A POSITIVE ATTITUDE, BUILD CONFIDENCE AND SELF ESTEEM OF THOSE AFFECTED BY STROKE OR OTHER LTNC. 2.2 IMPROVING AND DEVELOPING THE PHYSICAL SKILLS OF THOSE ATTENDING THE GROUP THROUGH THE PROVISION OF STRUCTURED EXERCISE SESSIONS. 2.3 PROVIDE AN ENVIRONMENT AND OPPORTUNITIES THAT ENCOURAGE CLIENTS TO DEVELOP AND BUILD ON SOCIAL SKILLS THAT MAY HAVE BEEN AFFECTED BY THEIR CONDITIONS. 2.4 RAISE AWARENESS OF THE IMPACT OF STROKE AND LTNC IN THE COMMUNITY.
Area of benefit
CAMBRIDGESHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
6B Station Road
ELY
Cambridgeshire
CB7 4BS
- Phone:
- 01353 662841
- Email:
- posability3@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window