PRAYER CENTRE CHURCH OF GOD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Preaching the word of God, Empowering people from every walk of life to become the Best in all that God has called them to be walking in Faith and Advancing into their God given destiny. God has concealed something inside you, this will come into fullness of your calling and become all that God wants you to be.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Barnsley
- Kent
- Surrey
- Throughout London
- Nigeria
- United States
Governance
- 21 February 2013: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Balogun | Trustee | 07 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
PASTOR SAMSON OLUWAMODEDE | Trustee | 25 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
VICTORIA OLAJUGBA | Trustee | 28 January 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £80.31k | £23.21k | £34.76k | £48.65k | £43.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.62k | £35.07k | £31.18k | £22.57k | £72.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 294 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2024 | 294 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 April 2023 | 84 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 June 2022 | 149 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 March 2021 | 52 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/09/2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 04/02/2013
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN SUCH WAYS AND IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
108 Marston Avenue
DAGENHAM
Essex
RM10 7LJ
- Phone:
- 07939358328
- Email:
- prayercentre2011@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window