Financial history BRISTOL JAZZ AND BLUES FESTIVAL

Charity number: 1149781
Charity reporting is up to date (48 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/05/2021 31/05/2022 31/05/2023 31/05/2024
Total gross income £37.02k £19.48k £94.79k £21.40k £96.24k
Total expenditure £41.06k £32.01k £85.62k £39.36k £86.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A £1.30k £19.05k