BRISTOL JAZZ AND BLUES FESTIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote, improve, develop & maintain public appreciation of jazz, blues and similar genres of music by a) the presentation of high quality artists in festival format in the city of Bristol & further afield when necessary, and b) by such other means at the Trustees discretion cooperating with like minded organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2023
Total income includes £1,300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
24 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Bath And North East Somerset
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 15 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charlotte Crofton-Sleigh | Trustee | 04 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Nigel Cox | Trustee | 08 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Nigel John Evans | Trustee | 07 August 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2019 | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £205.92k | £37.02k | £19.48k | £94.79k | £21.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £194.79k | £41.06k | £32.01k | £85.62k | £39.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.50k | N/A | N/A | N/A | £1.30k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 42 days | |
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 14 June 2024 | 75 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | 31 March 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 24 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | 21 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 21 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, IMPROVE, DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC APPRECIATION OF MUSIC IN JAZZ AND SIMILAR GENRE BY: A) THE PRESENTATION OF HIGH QUALITY ARTIST'S WORK IN FESTIVAL FORMAT IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL AND FARTHER AFIELD IF NECESSARY AND B) BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AT THE TRUSTEES DISCRETION COOPERATING WITH LIKE MINDED ORGANISATIONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 High Street
Worle
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
Avon
BS22 6ET
- Phone:
- 01179049137
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window