THE KOFIA TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
General charitable purposes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 26 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susanna Marie-Louise Huth | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Katarina Sophie Huth | Trustee | 01 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
NIKOLAS CHARLES HUTH | Trustee | 15 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTOPHER WILHELM HUTH | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
HELENE NOTBURGA HUTH | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
Johannes Huth | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH MARGARETE HUTH | Trustee | 24 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £102 | £0 | £0 | £129 | £1.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.00k | £3.60k | £2.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 20 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 22 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 19 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 31 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 AUG 2012
Charitable objects
TO, OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF, SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT, PROVIDED THAT NO PART OF THE PROPERTY AND FUNDS OF THE CHARITY MAY BE USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SETTLOR OR ANY TRUSTEE OR ANY SPOUSE OR CIVIL PARTNER OF THE SETTLOR OR ANY TRUSTEE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
61 Rutland Gate
61 Rutland Gate
London
London
SW7 1PJ
- Phone:
- 02072277000
- Email:
- Kofia.Trust@huth.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window