KURDISH COUNCIL OF IMAMS & PREACHERS IN BRITAIN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
culture selebration,giving advice to the community
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 04 February 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charitable Activities
- Bradford City
- Gateshead
- Leeds City
- Manchester City
- Peterborough City
- Portsmouth City
Governance
- 13 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
EMIN KHEDER | Chair | 05 November 2012 |
|
|||||
ABDULLBASIT ABDULLAH | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM HAMASALIH | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
LASHKAR CHUSTI | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDULQADIR MUHAMMED ABDULQAIR | Trustee | 05 November 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/02/2019 | 04/02/2020 | 04/02/2021 | 04/02/2022 | 04/02/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £100 | £150 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Total expenditure | £600 | £100 | £150 | £100 | £100 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 04 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 149 days | |
Annual return | 04 February 2023 | 18 October 2024 | 319 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2022 | 18 October 2024 | 684 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2021 | 18 October 2024 | 1049 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 04 February 2020 | 18 October 2024 | 1414 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 February 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/03/2011 AS AMENDED ON 11/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER OR BENEFIT THE PUBLIC WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX,SEXUAL ORIENTATION,RACE OR OF POLITICAL,RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID PUBLIC AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES,VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE PUBLIC.TO ADVANCE ISLAMIC EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT.THE PROMOTION OF RACIAL HARMONY FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY:(FOR EXAMPLE)(A)PROMOTING KNOWLEDGE AND MUTUAL UNDERSTANDING BETWEEN DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS;(B)ADVANCING EDUCATION AND RAISING AWARENESS ABOUT DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS TO PROMOTE GOOD RELATIONS BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS;(C)WORKING TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF DISCRIMINATION ON THE GROUNDS OF RACE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BM KCIPB
LONDON
WC1N 3XX
- Phone:
- 07930600629
- Email:
- anjuman1@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window