LEARNING AND COMMUNITY SPORT @ WORLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Trust provides day care facilities for adults with learning difficulties via the Brandon Trust. A pottery (operated by Banwell Pottery) is in operation. A meal service (Meals on Wheels) is provided through the centre's kitchens. Sporting facilities available to the community include a dance studio, gym, clubhouse and an all weather 3G football pitch.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£648,255
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £601.87k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £30 | |
Other | £46.36k |
Total expenditure:
£659,351
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £659.35k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £659.35k |
People

15 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 09 November 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Benedict Milsom | Chair | 01 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Claire Daly | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Richard Edward James Dakin | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul William Magor | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Steven Lugg | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Diana Mary Ireland | Trustee | 13 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Andrew Blackborow | Trustee | 25 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Paul Brian Savage | Trustee | 01 September 2018 |
|
|
||||
MS Lisa Marie Shortland | Trustee | 01 December 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £351.98k | £289.72k | £349.82k | £292.71k | £648.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £362.36k | £400.57k | £382.59k | £510.18k | £659.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £601.87k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £46.36k | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £659.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £308.55k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £36.84k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £82.42k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 26 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 26 July 2024 | 26 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 05 October 2022 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2022 | 245 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 02 March 2022 | 245 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 12 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 24/08/2012
Charitable objects
3.1 THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO: (A)PROMOTE THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION, SPORT, CULTURE OR OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF HEALTHY LIFE STYLES, SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF INCREASING ACCESSIBILITY AND IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF INDIVIDUALS THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; (B)RELIEVE THE NEED OF INDIVIDUALS WITH LEARNING DISABILITIES, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING SUPPORT AND ASSISTANCE TO THE INDIVIDUALS, THEIR FAMILIES AND THEIR CARERS TO ENCOURAGE THE INDIVIDUALS TO BE ACTIVELY INVOLVED IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY; (C)ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGHOUT THE UNITED KINGDOM, INCLUDING, IN PARTICULAR IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND OF STUDENTS OF THE SCHOOL, BY PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF SPORTS AND OTHER FACILITIES IN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND, IN PARTICULAR, AT SCHOOLS; AND (D)PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL, IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION, DECIDE. "LEARNING DISABILITIES" SHALL INCLUDE ANY MENTAL HANDICAP, DEVELOPMENTAL DISABILITY OF THE MIND AND ANY ASSOCIATED CONDITION HOWSOEVER CAUSED WHICH AFFECTS AN INDIVIDUAL?S ABILITY TO UNDERSTAND NEW OR COMPLEX INFORMATION, LEARN NEW SKILLS OR COPE INDEPENDENTLY. "LOCAL COMMUNITY" MEANS THE COMMUNITY OF WORLE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA. "SCHOOL" MEANS WORLE COMMUNITY SCHOOL, OF REDWING DRIVE, MEAD VALE, WESTON-SUPER-MARE, SOMERSET, BS22 8XX, A SCHOOL WITHIN THE MEANING OF THE EDUCATION ACTS OR SUCH OTHER SCHOOL AS SHALL REPLACE IT.
Area of benefit
WORLE AND ITS SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
At Worle
58 New Bristol Road
WESTON-SUPER-MARE
BS22 6AQ
- Phone:
- 01934886111
- Email:
- criley@worle.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window