OMEGA FIRE MINISTRIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
involved in the motivation of her members to develop fully their potential in every area of endeavour spiritually, mentally, economically and physically. ministering to the needs of people from all walks of life within and outside the organisation. run ICT club that project helps teens and youth to improve their ICT skills like office suit. run monthly music instruments classes for youth.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022
People

3 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 29 November 2012: Standard registration
- OMEGA FIRE MINISTIRES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ESTHER OGHENEKEVBE ONOJEDJE | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMED HASSAN JALLOH | Trustee | 01 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
OSARO NEHIGIE | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2018 | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.63k | £105.01k | £103.23k | £101.97k | £68.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £104.46k | £119.24k | £75.94k | £99.62k | £82.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days | |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 25 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 23 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 22 July 2021 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 45 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 14 August 2020 | 45 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/08/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 27/11/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON CHRISTIANITY TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION. 2) THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN SUCH WAYS AS MAY BE THOUGHT FIT. 3) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO THE AGE OF 25 BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (A) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (B) ADVANCING EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
UNDEFINED. IN PRACTICE, LOCAL.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 ADOMAR ROAD
DAGENHAM
RM8 3LR
- Phone:
- 07984496693
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window