BRIGHT SKY CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
(a) to relieve poverty, sickness and distress of young people from disadvantaged communities; (b) to develop the capability of the young people; (c) to advance education through the provision of funds, materials, and other education activities as appropriate; (d) the provision of recreational and leisure time activities; (e) to promote any other charitable activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2016
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Hillingdon
Governance
- 26 November 2012: Standard registration
- 09 May 2019: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2013 | 30/11/2014 | 30/11/2015 | 30/11/2016 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.40k | £8.73k | £610 | £700 | |
|
Total expenditure | £180 | £2.40k | £12.38k | £9.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2016 | 31 August 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2016 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2015 | 25 August 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2015 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 19/11/2012
Charitable objects
THE CHARITIES OBJECTS ARE RESTRICTED TO :- (A)TO RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS OF YOUNG PEOPLE FROM SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED COMMUNITIES (B) TO DEVELOP THE CAPABILITY AND SKILLS OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS TO PARTICIPATE FULLY IN SOCIETY (C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FUNDS, EDUCATION MATERIALS, SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION, AND OTHER EDUCATION ACTIVITIES AS APPROPRIATE AND INCLUDING EDUCATION IN THE ARTS (E) THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES PROVIDED IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE, DESIGNED TO IMPROVE YOUNG PEOPLES CONDITIONS OF LIFE (E) TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES WITHIN THE LAW AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY WILL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window