Financial history HALIMA SADIA ORPHANAGE RELIEF ORGANISATION

Charity Number: 1148983
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £12.35k £11.80k £18.60k £17.94k £5.66k
Total expenditure £12.35k £11.60k £14.50k £17.95k £5.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A