HALIMA SADIA ORPHANAGE RELIEF ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Health Education Food Shelter Clothing
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
- Kenya
- Somalia
Governance
- 17 September 2012: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
UBAH HASHI DIRIE | Chair | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
LIBAN ABDIWAHID MOHAMUD | Trustee | 25 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
SAMIRA ABDIWHID MOHAMUD | Trustee | 12 September 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £12.35k | £11.80k | £18.60k | £17.94k | £5.66k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.35k | £11.60k | £14.50k | £17.95k | £5.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 05 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 25 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 07 SEP 2012
Charitable objects
(I)TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC,PARTICULARLY,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,THE ORPHANS,THE POOR AND NEEDY IN THE UK AND ABROAD,BY MEANS OF,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,THE PROVISION OF PRIMARY,SECONDARY AND EDUCATIONAL PROGRAMMES AND FACILITIES,SUCH AS SCHOOLS,TRAINING CENTRES AND SCHOLARSHIPS;(II)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND TO PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH AMONG POOR PEOPLE,ORPHANS,THE DISABLED AND PEOPLE IN NEED,BY MEANS OF,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES OR SERVICES FOR TREATMENT,FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE,SUPPORT AND EDUCATION,INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF SPORTING ACTIVITIES;(III)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG POOR PEOPLE,ORPHANS,THE DISABLED,THE ELDERLY,VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS AND OTHER PEOPLE IN NEED,BY MEANS OF,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,MAKING GRANTS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS,EQUIPMENT,SERVICES AND FACILITIES,INCLUDING THE PROVISION OF FOOD,WATER,CLOTHING AND ACCOMMODATION FOR THE SAID PERSONS;(IV)TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM,BY MEANS OF,BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY,PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM,PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION,IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD(PBUH)AS DEFINED AND INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAA-AH;(V)TO PROMOTE SOCIAL INCLUSION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT BY PREVENTING PEOPLE,ESPECIALLY,BUT NOT LIMITED TO,YOUNG PEOPLE,PEOPLE SUFFERING FROM DRUGS MISUSE,PRISONERS AND EX-OFFENDERS AND THEIR FAMILIES FROM BECOMING SOCIALLY EXCLUDED,RELIEVING THEIR NEEDS AND ASSISTING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO SOCIETY BY ANY MEANS THOUGHT FIT BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kemp House
160 City Road
London
EC1V 2NX
- Phone:
- 07897410761
- Email:
- Hsoro2013@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window