THE BRITISH ENDODONTIC SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE ACTIVITIES OF THE BRITISH ENDODONTIC SOCIETY AIM TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ENDODONTOLOGY TO ENSURE THAT THE DENTAL AND GENERAL HEALTH OF THE NATION IS BOTH MAINTAINED AND IMPROVED, AND THAT LIFE LONG EDUCATION IS ENCOURAGED AND FACILITATED.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 02 October 2012: Standard registration
- 19 January 2015: Funds received from 274392 THE BRITISH ENDODONTIC SOCIETY
- BRITISH ENDODONTIC SOCIETY (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Maria De Los Angeles Vallina Ornaque | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Sadia Ambreen Niazi | Trustee | 08 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Philip Mitchell | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samuel Mark McAlistair | Trustee | 16 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rahul Patel | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sanjay Maganlal Ardeshna | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Shalini Kanagasingam | Trustee | 11 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr William McLean | Trustee | 11 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Satnam Singh Virdee | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Risha Patel | Trustee | 20 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Giuseppe Di Filippo | Trustee | 10 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Dr Phillip Leo Tomson | Trustee | 14 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dipti Mehta | Trustee | 14 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Daniel Vaz de Souza | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
||||
Alyn Morgan | Trustee | 04 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £317.97k | £279.34k | £315.31k | £383.74k | £473.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £353.80k | £251.54k | £307.44k | £452.36k | £421.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 26 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 26 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 17 AUG 2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ADVANCE ENDODONTOLOGY TO ENSURE THAT THE DENTAL AND GENERAL HEALTH OF THE NATION IS BOTH MAINTAINED AND IMPROVED, AND THAT LIFE LONG EDUCATION OF THE PRACTITIONER IS ENCOURAGED AND FACILITATED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
BES
PO Box 1239
AYLESBURY
Buckinghamshire
HP22 9UU
- Phone:
- 07762945847
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window