THE ALLAN WILLETT FOUNDATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Foundation supports a number of charities and projects in accordance with its objectives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2019
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Kent
- Medway
- Kenya
Governance
- 15 November 2012: Standard registration
- 17 March 2020: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | 31/03/2019 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £46.25k | £37.16k | £16.35k | £96 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £76.95k | £293.71k | £1.04m | £127.74k | £290.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | 10 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 02 July 2019 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 31 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 31 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 01 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 05/09/2014
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST ARE THE ADVANCEMENT OF SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION THINK FIT AND IN PARTICULAR BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING THE ADVANCEMENT OF CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF PERSONS LIVING WORKING AND STUDYING IN THE COUNTY OF KENT AND THE DISTRICT OF NANDI IN THE RIFT VALLEY PROVINCE OF KENYA AND PROMOTING THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ARMED FORCES OF GREAT BRITAIN.
Area of benefit
KENYA / GREAT BRITAIN
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window