MUSLIM WELFARE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Establish a mosque for worship for Muslims and Madrassah teaching Islamic education to children. the charity will relieve the financial hardship in countries as Somalia, Tanzania, Kenya, Uganda by providing Food and water, Education, Healthcare, ang Livelihoods.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 October 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Recreation
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Northamptonshire
- Throughout London
- Kenya
- Somalia
- Tanzania
- Uganda
Governance
- 02 October 2012: Standard registration
- TAWHIYD COMMUNITY TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Saleh Ally | Chair | 01 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ABDUL NAKEEB | Trustee | 20 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
MOHAMMED ABDILLAHI | Trustee | 28 February 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/10/2020 | 30/10/2021 | 30/10/2022 | 30/10/2023 | 30/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.00k | £46.89k | £19.00k | £17.00k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.80k | £46.96k | £18.70k | £17.30k | £4.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 October 2024 | 24 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2023 | 26 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2022 | 24 April 2024 | 238 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 October 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 16 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2021 | 15 September 2022 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 October 2020 | 08 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 SEP 2012 AS AMENDED ON 09 DEC 2016
Charitable objects
(I)TO ADVANCE THE RELIGION OF ISLAM, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, PROMOTING THE TEACHINGS AND TENETS OF ISLAM, PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR WORSHIP AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR ISLAMIC EDUCATION, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TEACHINGS OF THE QURAAN AND THE SUNNAH OF THE PROPHET MUHAMMAD (PBUH) AS DEFINED AND INTERPRETED BY THE AHLE SUNNAH WAL JAMAA-AH; (II)THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR PUBLIC BENEFIT, BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, THE PROVISION OF TRAINING, SUPPLEMENTARY EDUCATION, ADULT LEARNING CLASSES, LANGUAGE CLASSES, FACILITIES FOR NURSERY EDUCATION AND ACTIVITIES PROMOTING MAINSTREAM EDUCATIONAL SUBJECTS AND ANY SUCH ACTIVITIES AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT; (III)TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONG THE POOR, THE UNDERPRIVILEGED, VICTIMS OF NATURAL AND MAN-MADE DISASTERS AND PEOPLE IN NEED BY MEANS OF, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, MAKING GRANTS OR LOANS FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, EQUIPMENT, SERVICES AND FACILITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE SAID PERSONS; (IV)TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE; (VII)TO PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE IN NEED THAT THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Crane Walk
Northampton
NN3 8YE
- Phone:
- 07453757566
- Email:
- admin@muslimwelfaretrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window