UMOR PUR UNION WELFARE AND DEVELOPMENT ORGANISATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
ADVICE ON EDUCATION. COUNSELING POOR ON FOOD AND HEALTH AND PROVIDE POSSIBLE FINANCE. SOCIAL WELFARE AND OTHER LEISURE ACTIVITIES WITH THE HELP OF VOLUNTEERS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Bangladesh
Governance
- 13 December 2012: Standard registration
- UPUWDO (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Shamim Uddin | Chair | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
mohammed khan | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
MD ILIAS AHMED IMRAN | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.02k | £5.10k | £2.08k | £20.18k | £4.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £521 | £2.63k | £7.56k | £399 | £3.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 21 May 2025 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 July 2024 | 91 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 10 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JUL 2012 AS AMENDED ON 11/12/2012
Charitable objects
1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN TOWER HAMLETS, LONDON AND BANGLADESH. 2. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL NEED AND SUFFERING AMONG VICTIMS OF NATURAL OR OTHER KINDS OF DISASTER IN BANGLADESH, IN THE FORM OF MONEY, FOOD AND SHELTER (OR OTHER MEANS DEEMED SUITABLE) FOR PERSONS, BODIES AND ORGANISATIONS. 3. THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN TOWER HAMLETS, LONDON AND BANGLADESH. 4. TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
96 Tooley Street
LONDON
SE1 2TH
- Phone:
- 07944601778
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window