Financial history AEROBILITY

Charity number: 1149629
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £579.59k £1.25m £611.32k £932.26k £849.66k
Total expenditure £671.57k £467.46k £547.46k £742.15k £1.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £745.00k N/A £297.90k £62.21k
Income - Donations and legacies £229.44k £985.69k £202.53k £560.48k £498.54k
Income - Other trading activities £185.29k £167.76k £266.34k £241.50k £223.18k
Income - Charitable activities £142.96k £49.59k £73.26k £107.45k £113.25k
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £191 £9.04k £12.14k £22.30k £14.68k
Income - Other £21.72k £35.07k £57.05k £525 £0
Income - Legacies £12.82k £5.00k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities £480.88k £290.39k £316.15k £440.31k £532.83k
Expenditure - Raising funds £190.69k £177.07k £231.32k £301.84k £433.22k
Expenditure - Governance £465 £4.98k £2.18k £46.57k £39.33k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £407.80k