Trustees AEROBILITY
Charity number: 1149629

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SHONA ANNE BOWMAN | Chair | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Benjamin Chad Griffiths | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Christian Fahey | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Fleur Cox | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jameson Robert Mark Smith | Trustee | 20 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil John Tucker | Trustee | 01 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Simon Morgan Warr | Trustee | 26 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Allister Huw Bridger | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Paul Winstanley | Trustee | 06 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
JON WINDOVER | Trustee | 08 October 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.