Financial history BILLY'S WISH

Charity number: 1150909
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £9.04k £8.87k £10.37k £9.20k £875
Total expenditure £8.40k £3.98k £12.85k £7.34k £25.31k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A