ST THOMAS' LYDIATE PCC

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
St Thomas' Church proclaiming the good news of Jesus Christ by witness and example to the whole community of Lydiate and Downholland. It has been a busy year, however on the whole the PCC is pleased with it's achievements against the objectives as set out in the Annual Report (Page 4).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

15 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Lancashire
- Sefton
Governance
- 20 November 2012: Previously excepted registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Susan Douglas Salt | Chair | 15 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lance Owen Grundy MBE | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Barbara Rainford | Trustee | 19 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joan Angela Cook | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth John Fleming | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Carly Maria Michelle Cleator | Trustee | 01 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
JOANNE JAMIE BERNADETTE ROWE | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
WENDY FREDA KELLY | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
JEAN ANNE CROPPER | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS VAL BLAKEMORE RN/RM | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
CAROL HAZEL SIBBRING | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
VERA AINSWORTH | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEBRA WALKER | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|||||
DAVID FRANCIS WALKER | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|||||
ELERI JANE JONES | Trustee | 23 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £91.25k | £89.52k | £70.80k | £85.42k | £94.42k | |
|
Total expenditure | £97.32k | £126.33k | £84.90k | £75.72k | £91.56k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 January 2025 | 88 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 17 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 November 2020 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL POWERS MEASURE (1956) AS AMENDED AND CHURCH REPRESENTATION RULES THAT CAME INTO FORCE ON 02/01/1956
Charitable objects
PROMOTING IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH THE WHOLE MISSION OF THE CHURCH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. THOMAS VICARAGE
CHURCH LANE
LYDIATE
LIVERPOOL
L31 4HL
- Phone:
- 01515260512
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window