THE SHEILING SPECIAL EDUCATION TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our school and college offer an individualised and flexible approach to placements. 38-week, day, extended day, weekly and termly boarding for students aged from 6-25 years We provide a living, working and learning environment that is comfortable, beautiful and natural, befitting of a home away from home with extensive SEND facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income:
£8,810,518
Donations and legacies | £54.15k | |
Charitable activities | £8.66m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £98.12k | |
Other | £1.13k |
Total expenditure:
£8,060,591
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £8.06m | |
Other | £0 |
£98,121 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £8,657,113 from 76 government contract(s) and £47,188 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.06m | |
Retained for future use | £749.93k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £8.06m | |
Retained for future use | £848.05k |
People

249 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 5 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
Governance
- 09 October 2012: Standard registration
- THE SHEILING RINGWOOD (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MR J FREEMAN | Chair | 05 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
ELAINE ANNE PEACHEY | Trustee | 06 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
JONATHAN RUPERT BOWDEN BLAKE | Trustee | 20 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Ronald Kent Lincoln | Trustee | 05 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Vanda North | Trustee | 16 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alice Copp | Trustee | 28 April 2020 |
|
|
||||
David Keeton | Trustee | 06 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANET KENWARD BSC PGCE | Trustee | 03 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
MR J PYZER | Trustee | 02 August 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.86m | £8.18m | £8.64m | £8.91m | £8.81m | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.95m | £6.78m | £7.22m | £7.75m | £8.06m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £7.79m | £7.35m | £8.55m | £8.81m | £8.66m | |
|
Income from government grants | £21.34k | N/A | £33.80k | £31.83k | £47.19k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £42.67k | £34.87k | £67.48k | £77.83k | £54.15k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £8.13m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £7.79m | £0 | £8.55m | £8.81m | £8.66m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £21.34k | £21.76k | £22.84k | £19.23k | £98.12k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.24k | £1.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £7.95m | £6.78m | £7.22m | £7.75m | £8.06m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £36.54k | £0 | £0 | £151.69k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £6.77m | £6.53m | £6.54m | £6.78m | £6.93m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £3.71m | £5.43m | £7.31m | £8.00m | £8.56m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.56m | £2.72m | £3.20m | £2.97m | £2.94m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 27 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 21 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 29 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 07 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 18 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 22 JUN 2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 23 JAN 2020
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY’S OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") ARE 2.1 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY ESTABLISHING, MAINTAINING, CARRYING ON, MANAGING AND DEVELOPING EDUCATIONAL INSTITUTIONS WITH SPECIALIST EDUCATIONAL SUPPORT AND PROVISION FOR CHILDREN AND YOUNG ADULTS WITH SPECIAL EDUCATIONAL NEEDS AND/OR SPECIAL CARE NEEDS; AND 2.2 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, PROMOTE GOOD HEALTH, PROVIDE CARE TO AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE WITH A DISABILITY (WHETHER MENTAL OR PHYSICAL), THE YOUNG, THE OLD, OR PEOPLE OTHERWISE IN NEED, IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PRINCIPLES OF DR RUDOLF STEINER (AS SUMMARISED IN SCHEDULE 2 TO THESE ARTICLES), PARTICULARLY (WITHOUT LIMITATION) BY THE ESTABLISHMENT AND MAINTENANCE OF INTENTIONAL COMMUNITIES IN THE FORM OF VILLAGES, RESIDENTIAL HOUSES, DAY CENTRES, KINDERGARTENS, SCHOOLS, COLLEGES OR OTHER TYPES OF SOCIAL AND/OR EDUCATIONAL COMMUNITY, IN WHICH BENEFICIARIES LIVE AND/OR WORK AND/OR TO WHICH THEY OTHERWISE RESORT, IN COMMUNITY WITH PERSONS PROVIDING SUPPORT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE SHEILING RINGWOOD
HORTON ROAD
ASHLEY
RINGWOOD
HAMPSHIRE
BH24 2EB
- Phone:
- 01425482483
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window