ST PAULS COMMUNITY SPORTS AND SOCIAL CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Lancashire
Governance
- 08 November 2012: Standard registration
- 27 June 2013: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Accounts and annual returns
Governing document
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 10 SEP 2012 NOW ARTICLES ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30/10/2012 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 05/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF LEIGH, LANCASHIRE AND THE SURROUNDING AREA THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION OF INDIVIDUALS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES OR FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.