Financial history BETTERING EDUCATION LIMITED

Charity number: 1149103
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2019 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023
Total gross income £23.30k £23.99k £7.37k £47.33k £2.87k
Total expenditure £22.68k £22.29k £8.39k £52.56k £2.66k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £2.50k N/A N/A N/A