Trustees SHELLEY COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION
Charity Number: 1149146

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ann Priestman | Chair | 27 September 2012 |
|
|||||
Damian Charles Stansfield | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Carol Rowatt | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|||||
David John Rowatt | Trustee | 14 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Martin Edward Smith | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Jill Marie Catherine Allen | Trustee | 09 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Janice Parsley | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carole Hepworth | Trustee | 06 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
SHEILA TARBATT | Trustee | 13 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE HUGHES | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN ANDREW ALLEN | Trustee | 14 November 2012 |
|
|
||||
ANTHONY CLIFTON | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
||||
LORNA CAROLYN MACDONALD | Trustee | 27 September 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.