COMMUNITY ACTION MALVERN AND DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are a local charity offering community transport solutions for older and disabled people. We have our own minibuses and wheelchair accessible vehicles and manage a community car service. We run trips for people to get out and about, have a men's (and women's)shed and offer a volunteer brokerage service for local community groups, matching local people with their ideal volunteering opportunity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £29,300 from 3 government contract(s) and £5,450 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
95 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Worcestershire
Governance
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kevin Ebsworth MBE | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Dawson Bartlett | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Michael Palmer | Trustee | 04 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Cllr Anne Monica Madelaine Robinson | Trustee | 29 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
RUSSELL EMERY | Trustee | 21 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Peter Nicholas Hubble | Trustee | 01 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
Mike Amery | Trustee | 22 July 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.38k | £151.62k | £165.56k | £198.74k | £288.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £222.39k | £159.85k | £187.97k | £202.49k | £262.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £33.98k | N/A | £23.78k | £25.00k | £29.30k | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.90k | £10.90k | £13.40k | £26.50k | £5.45k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 18 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 14 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 14/08/2012
Charitable objects
1) TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, PRINCIPALLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE LOCAL GOVERNMENT AREA OF MALVERN AND THE SURROUNDING DISTRICTS AND ITS ENVIRONS AND, IN PARTICULAR, BUILD THE CAPACITY OF THIRD SECTOR ORGANISATIONS AND PROVIDE THEM WITH THE NECESSARY SUPPORT, INFORMATION AND SERVICES TO ENABLE THEM TO PURSUE OR CONTRIBUTE TO ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE. 2) TO PROMOTE, ORGANISE AND FACILITATE CO-OPERATION AND PARTNERSHIP WORKING BETWEEN THIRD SECTOR, STATUTORY AND OTHER RELEVANT BODIES IN THE ACHIEVEMENT OF THE ABOVE PURPOSES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT.
Contact information
- Address:
-
112 Worcester Road
Malvern Link
Worcestershire
WR14 1SS
- Phone:
- 01684892381
- Email:
- info@communityaction.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window