Financial history THE LILY MAE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1149341
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £242.17k £313.90k £383.78k £390.84k £571.04k
Total expenditure £205.31k £275.46k £386.75k £470.13k £497.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £358.13k
Income - Other trading activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £4.39k
Income - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £204.19k
Income - Endowments N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Income - Investment N/A N/A N/A N/A £3.85k
Income - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £501
Income - Legacies N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Charitable activities N/A N/A N/A N/A £395.14k
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A £102.60k
Expenditure - Governance N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Grants institution N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Investment management N/A N/A N/A N/A £0
Expenditure - Other N/A N/A N/A N/A £0