BRIGHTON AND HOVE PROGRESSIVE SYNAGOGUE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Shabbat and festival services conducted in both Hebrew and English; promoting gender equality in all aspects of congregational life; life-cycle commemorations; life-long learning from pre-school to adult. Access to Judaism and all levels of Hebrew; lending library; regular social and cultural activities; interfaith work; pastoral support of members; social action; school visits.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Brighton And Hove
- East Sussex
- West Sussex
Governance
- 16 October 2012: Standard registration
- B&HPS (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Bray | Trustee | 11 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Levi Oliver Campbell | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Graeme David Butler | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Esther Rachel Polden | Trustee | 10 September 2019 |
|
|||||
BENITA MATOFSKA | Trustee | 27 June 2018 |
|
|||||
Karen Katz | Trustee | 29 July 2015 |
|
|||||
Michael John Regan | Trustee | 13 June 2014 |
|
|||||
MARTIN WINSTONE | Trustee | 24 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
LOUISE MORDECAI | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
|||||
SANDRA ANNE WALKER | Trustee | 25 September 2012 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £98.52k | £100.05k | £94.78k | £105.90k | £185.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £120.01k | £110.16k | £104.30k | £128.70k | £146.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.80k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 08/06/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/09/2012 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 02/09/2013
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF LIBERAL AND PROGRESSIVE JUDAISM; AND (2) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS AND RACIAL HARMONY, INCLUDING BUT NOT LIMITED TO PROMOTING INTER-FAITH ACTIVITIES.
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Lansdowne Road
Hove
BN3 1FF
- Phone:
- 01273737223
- Email:
- info@bhps-online.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window