1ST BUXTON SCOUT GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
WE ARE A SCOUT GROUP WHO WAS FOUNDED IN 1908 AND COVER ALL SECTIONS OF THE SCOUTING MOVEMENT. THESE ARE BEAVERS, CUBS AND SCOUTS. WE COVER A BROAD RANGE OF ACTIVITIES INVOLVING COMMUNITY PROJECTS, THE HEALTH AND WELL BEING AND DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG THROUGH A STRUCTURED SYSTEM WHICH HAS BEEN PROVEN OVER THE LAST 100 YEARS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 01 January 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 15 May 2013: Standard registration
- 09 July 2015: Removed (Does not operate)
- 06 August 2015: Re-registered
- 09 July 2016: Removed (Does not operate)
- 09 February 2018: Re-registered
- 28 March 2018: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 12 November 2018: Re-registered
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Charles Wittold Denton | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Deborah Kathleen Quinn | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
David Andrew Smith | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hollick | Trustee | 20 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Eloise Chaplin | Trustee | 23 November 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 01/01/2020 | 01/01/2021 | 01/01/2022 | 01/01/2023 | 01/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £31.48k | £28.54k | £42.56k | £22.52k | £25.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £25.84k | £31.93k | £25.79k | £40.44k | £26.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £11.44k | £17.44k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 01 January 2024 | 31 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2024 | 15 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2023 | 01 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 01 January 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2022 | 05 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2021 | 04 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 January 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 January 2020 | 21 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER GRANTED 04/01/1912
Charitable objects
PROMOTE THE DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN ACHIEVING THEIR FULL PHYSICAL,INTELLECTUAL,SOCIAL AND SPIRITUAL POTENTIAL;AS INDIVIDUALS,AS RESPONSIBLE CITIZENS AND AS MEMBERS OF THEIR LOCAL,NATIONAL AND INTERNATIONAL COMMUNITIES
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 Corbar Road
BUXTON
Derbyshire
SK17 6RJ
- Phone:
- 0129824815
- Email:
- ROBERTO5066@OUTLOOK.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window